+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor. S.J. 651.
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor. S.J. 633.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 633.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 550.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 484.
- Substituted SF 2250. H.J. 480.
- Amendment H-8105 adopted. H.J. 480.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment H-8105 filed. H.J. 479.
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 281.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (4)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor