+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor. H.J. 896.
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 895.
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 895.
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Senate amendment H-8313. H.J. 812.
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5177 adopted. S.J. 858.
- Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays none. S.J. 858.
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 807.
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 862.
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-8313. H.J. 812.
- Fiscal note. HCS.
- Passed House, ayes 93, nays none. H.J. 813.
- Immediate message. H.J. 816.
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 863.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5177 filed. S.J. 842.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 745.
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Dotzler, Feenstra, and McCoy. S.J. 673.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Fiscal note. HCS.
- Passed subcommittee.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Landon, Thomas, and Vander Linden. H.J. 378.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 269.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor