+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 467.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Sodders, Courtney, and Garrett. S.J. 495.
- Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 490.
- Message from House. S.J. 490.
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 436.
- Passed House, ayes 94, nays 5. H.J. 423.
- Amendment H-8021 adopted. H.J. 423.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment H-8021 filed. H.J. 311.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 182.
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor