+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (104)
On December 31, 2013 in the House:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor. H.J. 1114.
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 1113.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1113.
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 1113.
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 1111.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 1089.
- Conference committee report adopted. H.J. 1088.
- Passed House, ayes 95, nays none. H.J. 1088.
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 1095.
- Conference committee report filed. H.J. 1087.
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 1038.
- Conference committee report adopted. S.J. 1040.
- Passed Senate, ayes 40, nays 10. S.J. 1040.
- Immediate message. S.J. 1041.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 1089.
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed. S.J. 1039.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 812.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 760.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 732.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 752.
- Senate amendment H-1248. H.J. 753.
- House refused to concur in Senate amendment H-1248. H.J. 754.
- Immediate message. H.J. 755.
- House conference committee appointed Jorgensen, Dolecheck, Stanerson, Steckman, and Wood. H.J. 755.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted. S.J. 733.
- Senate conference committee appointed, Quirmbach, Chair; Bowman, Ernst, Sinclair, and Wilhelm. S.J. 733.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 755.
- Immediate message. H.J. 756.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 734.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Point of order raised on S-3116, ruled out of order. S.J. 726.
- Amendment S-3116 filed. S.J. 726.
- Amendment S-3118 filed, adopted. S.J. 726.
- Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 24. S.J. 727.
- Immediate message. S.J. 727.
- Amendment S-3106 adopted. S.J. 727.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3106 filed. S.J. 715.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 715.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Quirmbach, Ernst, and Schoenjahn. S.J. 322.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 352.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 300.
- Message from House. S.J. 300.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment H-1045 lost. H.J. 325.
- Amendment H-1016 as amended, adopted. H.J. 321.
- Amendment H-1020B adopted. H.J. 321.
- Amendment H-1049 to amendment H-1016 filed, adopted. H.J. 321.
- Ruled not germane amendment H-1039. H.J. 323.
- Amendment H-1017 lost. H.J. 322.
- Amendment H-1018 withdrawn. H.J. 322.
- Amendments H-1019, H-1021, and H-1022 adopted. H.J. 322.
- Point of order raised amendment H-1039 not germane. H.J. 323.
- Amendment H-1025 withdrawn. H.J. 320.
- Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1039. H.J. 323.
- Amendment H-1020A withdrawn. H.J. 320.
- Amendment H-1043 as amended, adopted. H.J. 318.
- Amendment H-1024 lost. H.J. 320.
- Amendment H-1023 withdrawn. H.J. 319.
- Amendment H-1015 adopted. H.J. 318.
- Amendment H-1052 to amendment H-1043 filed, adopted. H.J. 318.
- Amendment H-1051 to amendment H-1043 filed, adopted. H.J. 318.
- Amendment H-1014 adopted. H.J. 318.
- Amendment H-1047 to amendment H-1014 lost. H.J. 317.
- Amendment H-1047 to amendment H-1014 filed. H.J. 316.
- Amendment H-1048 to amendment H-1014 lost. H.J. 316.
- Amendment H-1048 to amendment H-1014 filed. H.J. 315.
- Fiscal note to amendment H-1014. HCS.
- Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 324.
- Point of order raised amendment H-1026 not germane. H.J. 329.
- Amendment H-1050 to amendment H-1033 filed, adopted. H.J. 325.
- Amendment H-1041 withdrawn. H.J. 329.
- Immediate message. H.J. 334.
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 335.
- Chief Clerk's report on correction in engrossment. H.J. 334.
- Passed House, ayes 52, nays 44. H.J. 332.
- Deferred, retained on calendar. H.J. 331.
- Amendment H-1038 withdrawn. H.J. 331.
- Amendment H-1033 as amended, lost. H.J. 326.
- Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 330.
- Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1026. H.J. 329.
- Ruled not germane amendment H-1026. H.J. 329.
- Amendment H-1034 withdrawn. H.J. 330.
- Amendment H-1028 lost. H.J. 329.
- Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1032. H.J. 328.
- Amendments H-1036, H-1037, and H-1042 withdrawn. H.J. 329.
- Amendments H-1044 and H-1030 lost. H.J. 327.
- Point of order raised amendment H-1032 not germane. H.J. 327.
- Ruled not germane amendment H-1032. H.J. 327.
- Amendment H-1029 lost. H.J. 326.
- Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 328.
- Amendment H-1040 lost. H.J. 329.
- Amendment H-1035 withdrawn. H.J. 329.
- Amendment H-1027 out of order. H.J. 329.
- Amendment H-1031 lost. H.J. 329.
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Amendments H-1041, H-1042, H-1043, H-1044, and H-1045 filed. H.J. 307.
- Amendments H-1032, H-1033, H-1034, H-1035, H-1036, H-1037, H-1038, H-1039, and H-1040 filed. H.J. 307.
- Amendments H-1023, H-1024, H-1025, H-1026, H-1027, H-1028, H-1029, H-1030, and H-1031 filed. H.J. 307.
- Amendments H-1014, H-1015, H-1016, H-1017, H-1018, H-1019, H-1020, H-1021, and H-1022 filed. H.J. 307.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 294.
- Pursuant to Rule 31.7, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 295.
- Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 295.
- Introduced, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 287.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Voted - Education.
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Education: Jorgensen Chair,Steckman,Stanerson,Dolecheck,Hanusa,Cohoon, and Winckler.
- Date Recorded