+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On December 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor. S.J. 695.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor. S.J. 649.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 649.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Withdrawn. H.J. 508.
- Substituted SF 187. H.J. 506.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 287.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Voted - Judiciary.
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Judiciary: Brandenburg Chair,Gassman, and Anderson.
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (4)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor