+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee reassigned, Windschitl, Kearns and Landon. H.J. 119.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee reassigned, Windschitl, Landon and Oldson. H.J. 112.
On December 31, 2013 in the House:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Windschitl, Oldson, and Sands. H.J. 729.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Fiscal note. HCS.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Fiscal note. HCS.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 290.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Voted - Veterans Affairs.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Veterans Affairs: Worthan Chair, and Alons,Kearns,Bacon,Salmon,Brandenburg,Costello,Miller, L.,Shaw,Stanerson,Windschitl,Gaines,Jacoby,Kajtazovic,Muhlbauer,Staed, and Thomas.
- Veterans Affairs: Worthan Chair,Miller, L., and Jacoby.
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor