+ − Transition
HSB222 is now HF728
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (36)
On April 21, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 28, nays 17.
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2022 11:00AM Room G15.
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Sweeney, Green, and Quirmbach.
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3225 filed.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 616.
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 04/28/2021 8:30AM RM 24A.
- Subcommittee: Sweeney, Green, and Quirmbach.
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Ways and Means.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 04/20/2021 8:30AM RM 24A.
- Subcommittee: Sweeney, Green, and Quirmbach.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Ways and Means.
On March 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/29/2021 12:00PM RM 24A.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Driscoll, J. Smith, and Williams.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Local Government.
- Message from House.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 83, nays 13.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 728.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/24/2021 9:30AM House Lounge 1.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Deyoe, Hunter and Shipley.
- Introduced, referred to Local Government.