+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (62)
On December 31, 2013 in the House:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor. H.J. 1115.
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 1114.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1114.
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 1098.
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 1053.
- Motion to reconsider vote withdrawn. S.J. 1052.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 1006.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Passed House, ayes 90, nays 6. H.J. 1054.
- Immediate message. H.J. 1054.
- Conference committee report filed. H.J. 1053.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed. S.J. 1006.
- Motion filed to reconsider vote on bill. S.J. 1010.
- Conference committee report adopted. S.J. 1006.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Conference committee report adopted. H.J. 1053.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 19. S.J. 1007.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 897.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 909.
- House conference committee appointed Watts, Gassman, Vander Linden, Hunter and Kelley. H.J. 908.
- Message from Senate. H.J. 908.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee appointed, Mathis, Anderson, Brase, Danielson, and Guth. S.J. 894.
- Senate insisted. S.J. 894.
- Message from House. S.J. 889.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 895.
- House refused to concur in Senate amendment H-1319. H.J. 894.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 894.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3148 adopted. S.J. 868.
- Amendment S-3159 adopted. S.J. 867.
- Amendment S-3165 filed, lost. S.J. 867.
- Amendment S-3158 adopted. S.J. 868.
- Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 23. S.J. 868.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Senate amendment H-1319 filed. H.J. 877.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 869.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 873.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3159 filed. S.J. 858.
- Amendment S-3158 filed. S.J. 858.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3148 filed. S.J. 839.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 839.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Mathis, Dvorsky, and Whitver. S.J. 808.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 619.
- Message from House. S.J. 619.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment H-1174 lost. H.J. 634.
- Amendment H-1187 lost. H.J. 630.
- Amendment H-1172 lost. H.J. 631.
- Amendment H-1170 lost. H.J. 632.
- Amendment H-1132 withdrawn. H.J. 632.
- Amendment H-1128 adopted. H.J. 633.
- Amendment H-1178A lost. H.J. 635.
- Amendment H-1173 withdrawn. H.J. 634.
- Amendment H-1179 ruled out of order. H.J. 634.
- Amendment H-1178B withdrawn. H.J. 635.
- Amendment H-1175 lost. H.J. 635.
- Passed House, ayes 52, nays 45. H.J. 636.
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 653.
- Immediate message. H.J. 651.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Amendments H-1178, H-1179, and H-1187 filed. H.J. 625.
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Amendments H-1170, H-1172, H-1173, H-1174, and H-1175 filed. H.J. 592.
- Amendments H-1128 and H-1132 filed. H.J. 590.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 563.
- Voted - Appropriations.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Appropriations: Watts Chair,Highfill, and Bearinger.
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (4)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor