+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On December 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Danielson, Jochum, and Smith. S.J. 352.
- Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 345.
- Message from House. S.J. 345.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 390.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 375.
- Passed House, ayes 96, nays none. H.J. 375.
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 302.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Voted - State Government.
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- State Government: Hein Chair,Highfill, and Taylor, T..
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor