+ − Transition
HSB198 is now SSB1190
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn.
- HF 719 substituted.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 0.
- Substituted for SF 553.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Attached to companion HF 719.
- Read first time, attached to companion SF 553.
- Message from House.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Explanations of votes.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Passed House, yeas 93, nays none.
- Immediate message.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 719.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 553.
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2021 8:30AM 217 Conference Room.
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Williams, Johnson, and Mathis.
- Introduced, referred to Commerce.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2021 11:30AM House Lounge 1.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Gobble, Brink and Hall.
- Introduced, referred to Information Technology.