+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On December 31, 2013 in the House:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor. H.J. 950.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 922.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 922.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 810.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 785.
- Passed Senate, ayes 39, nays 11. S.J. 785.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 738.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Bolkcom, Johnson, and Ragan. S.J. 693.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Passed House, ayes 95, nays none. H.J. 692.
- Amendment H-1210 to amendment H-1133 adopted. H.J. 691.
- Amendment H-1133 as amended, adopted. H.J. 691.
- Immediate message. H.J. 694.
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 698.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 685.
- Read first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 685.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment H-1210 filed. H.J. 671.
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment H-1133 filed. H.J. 590.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 547.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Voted - Human Resources.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Human Resources: Fry Chair,Heaton, and Smith, M..
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor