+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Sodders, Hogg, and Zaun. S.J. 97.
On December 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Sodders, Hogg, and Zaun. S.J. 687.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 647.
- Message from House. S.J. 647.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 669.
- Passed House, ayes 87, nays 11. H.J. 665.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Fiscal note. HCS.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 495.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Voted - Judiciary.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Judiciary: Brandenburg Chair,Wolfe, and Windschitl.
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (4)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor