+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On December 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor. S.J. 913.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor. S.J. 895.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 895.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 721.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 702.
- Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 702.
- Senate concurred with S-3086. S.J. 701.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Withdrawn. H.J. 678.
- Substituted SF 288. H.J. 677.
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-3086. S.J. 667.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Passed House, ayes 96, nays none. H.J. 677.
- Immediate message. H.J. 685.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 400.
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Voted - Judiciary.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Judiciary: Hess Chair,Heaton, and Dawson.
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (4)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor