+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On December 31, 2013 in the House:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 760.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Fiscal note. HCS.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 547.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Voted - Judiciary.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Judiciary: Kaufmann Chair,Gassman, and Olson, R..
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor