+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor. H.J. 704.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 670.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 670.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 544.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 523.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 522.
- Substituted for Senate File 370. S.J. 521.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time and attached to companion Senate File 370. S.J. 505.
- Message from House. S.J. 505.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 523.
- Passed House, ayes 98, nays 1. H.J. 522.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 447.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Voted - Judiciary.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Judiciary: Kaufmann Chair,Gassman, and Wessel-Kroeschell.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor