+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On December 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor. S.J. 695.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor. S.J. 649.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 649.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 576.
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Withdrawn. H.J. 582.
- Substituted SF 353. H.J. 580.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 497.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Voted - Human Resources.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Human Resources: Taylor, R. Chair,Hess, and Anderson.
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor