+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On December 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor. S.J. 914.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor. S.J. 895.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 895.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 773.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 783.
- Passed House, ayes 93, nays 5. H.J. 776.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 751.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Stanerson, Bacon, and Lensing. H.J. 671.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 1. S.J. 609.
- Amendment S-3033 adopted. S.J. 609.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 628.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 609.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 627.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3033 filed. S.J. 581.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 448.
- Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 435.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- State Government: Highfill Chair,Lensing, and Bacon.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (4)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor