+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (32)
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Secretary of State.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3030 filed, lost.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
- Amendment H-1017 to H-1016 adopted.
- Amendment H-1016 lost, as amended.
- Withdrawn.
- Withdrawn.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3029 filed, lost.
- Deferred.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- SJR 18 substituted.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, yeas 33, nays 16.
- Immediate message.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
- Read first time, passed on file.
- Substituted for HJR 13.
- Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken.
- Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point not well taken.
- Passed House, yeas 53, nays 46.
- Immediate message.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Amendments H-1016 and H-1017 filed.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SJR 18.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2019 3:10PM RM 19.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Windschitl, Kacena and Klein.
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Zaun, Bisignano, and Dawson.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Public Safety.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY
Type:
Primary Sponsor