+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
- Subcommittee: Committee of the Whole.
On April 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Government.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and attached to similar SJR 8.
- Message from House.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Point of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate.
- Withdrawn.
- Point of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate.
- Speaker ruled point well taken.
- Passed House, ayes 58 nays 38.
- Speaker ruled point well taken.
- Explanation of vote.
- Explanation of vote.
- Immediate message.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Nunn, Hinson and Wolfe.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor