+ − Transition
HF677 is now HF730
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/24/2021 10:00AM RM 24A.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Koelker, Bisignano, and Goodwin.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Commerce.
- Message from House.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Explanations of votes.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- Passed House, yeas 78, nays 15.
- Immediate message.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 730.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/01/2021 11:30AM House Lounge 1.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Mohr, G., Hansen and Nordman.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor