+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- SF 617 substituted.
- Amendment H-1251 adopted.
- Withdrawn.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1251 filed.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/18/2019 12:00PM RM 19.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Bossman, Forbes, Hein and Nielsen.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Ways and Means.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2019 3:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber.
- Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Bossman, Cohoon, Lensing and Sexton.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT
Type:
Primary Sponsor