+ − Transition
HSB95 is now SSB1121
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (64)
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 86, nays none.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-1430.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred with S-3107, as amended.
- Amendment S-3180A adopted.
- Amendment S-3180B adopted.
- Amendment S-3172 to S-3107 filed, withdrawn.
- Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Senate amendment H-1430 filed.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Amendment S-3180 to S-3107 filed.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-3107.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 94, nays none.
- Amendment H-1293 adopted.
- Amendment H-1282 withdrawn.
- Withdrawn.
- SF 578 substituted.
- Amendment H-1281 adopted.
- Withdrawn.
- Substituted for HF 827.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Amendments H-1282 and H-1293 filed.
- Amendment H-1281 filed.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
- Message from Senate.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3088 filed, adopted.
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 578.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 827.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 827.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/09/2021 8:00AM RM 24A.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee reassigned: Sweeney, Brown, and Jochum.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/03/2021 8:00AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Brown, Jochum, and Sweeney.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Maxwell, Gjerde and Nordman.
- Introduced, referred to Ways and Means.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 359.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2021 11:00AM RM 24A.
- Subcommittee: Zumbach, Kinney, and Rozenboom.
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Agriculture.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2021 1:00PM House Lounge.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2021 12:30PM RM 19 (Cancelled).
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Baxter, Breckenridge and McClintock.
- Introduced, referred to Agriculture.