+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation. H.J. 760.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Fiscal note. HCS.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 494.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Voted - Transportation.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Transportation: Moore Chair,Murphy, and Pettengill.
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor