+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (34)
On December 31, 2013 in the House:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor. H.J. 985.
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 948.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 948.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 888.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 891.
- Passed House, ayes 96, nays none. H.J. 888.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-1282. H.J. 888.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 793.
- Amendment S-3120 adopted. S.J. 792.
- Immediate message. S.J. 797.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Senate amendment H-1282 filed. H.J. 815.
- Message from Senate. H.J. 809.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note. SCS.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3120 filed. S.J. 738.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 738.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Mathis, Sinclair, and Wilhelm. S.J. 692.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment H-1068 adopted. H.J. 679.
- Amendment H-1214 to amendment H-1083 filed, adopted. H.J. 679.
- Amendment H-1083 as amended, adopted. H.J. 679.
- Amendment H-1203 withdrawn. H.J. 679.
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 667.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment H-1216 to amendment H-1212 filed, adopted. H.J. 679.
- Amendment H-1212 as amended, adopted. H.J. 679.
- Passed House, ayes 95, nays 1. H.J. 679.
- Immediate message. H.J. 685.
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 667.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Amendments H-1203 and H-1212 filed. H.J. 671.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment H-1083 filed. H.J. 556.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment H-1068 filed. H.J. 488.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 425.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Voted - Education.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Education: Garrett and Garrett - Co-chairs,Salmon, and Winckler.
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor