+ − Transition
HF860 is now SSB1261
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Explanation of vote.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- NOBA: Final
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
- Explanation of vote.
- Explanation of vote.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
- Explanation of vote.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- NOBA: Senate Floor
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-1499.
- Passed House, yeas 54, nays 36.
- Immediate message.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn.
- HF 860 substituted.
- Amendment S-3203 filed, adopted.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Senate amendment H-1499 filed.
- Message from Senate.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 28, nays 17.
- Amendment S-3206 filed, adopted.
- Substituted for SF 598.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
- Explanation of vote.
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Attached to similar HF 860.
- Read first time, attached to similar SF 598.
- Message from House.
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- NOBA: House Floor
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 54, nays 36.
- Amendment H-1419 withdrawn.
- Amendment H-1395 adopted.
- Amendment H-1447 filed, lost.
- Amendment H-1394 adopted.
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment H-1419 filed.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment H-1395 filed.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 598.
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
- Amendment H-1394 filed.
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Kraayenbrink, Bolkcom, Celsi, Costello, Cournoyer, Dotzler, Edler, Garrett, Guth, Johnson, Klimesh, Koelker, Lofgren, Mathis, Petersen, Ragan, Reichman, Rozenboom, Smith, J., Taylor, T., and Williams.
- Introduced, referred to Appropriations.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- NOBA: House Full Approps
- Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS
Type:
Primary Sponsor