+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Human Resources.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Committee amendment H-1175 filed.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Passed subcommittee.
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee, R. Taylor, Heddens, and Rizer.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Human Resources.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 7:45AM House Lounge
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Human Resources: Taylor, R. Chair, Rizer, McConkey
- Recorded