+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 27, 2022 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Signed by Governor.
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 97, nays 0.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-8291.
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0.
- Amendment S-5064 withdrawn.
- Amendment S-5095 filed, adopted.
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Senate amendment H-8291 filed.
- Fiscal note.
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5064 filed.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/14/2022 12:00PM Room 217 Conference Room.
- Subcommittee: Costello, Johnson, and Mathis.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Costello, Johnson, and Mathis.
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Human Resources.
- Message from House.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 95, nays none.
- Amendment H-1235 adopted.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment H-1235 filed.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 736.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2021 12:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Boden, Brown-Powers and Moore, T..
- Introduced, referred to Human Resources.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES
Type:
Primary Sponsor