+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee reassigned: R. Smith, Cournoyer, and Giddens.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee reassigned: R. Smith, Cournoyer, and Lykam.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to State Government.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: R. Smith, Cournoyer, and Danielson.
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to State Government.