+ − Transition
HSB719 is now SF2343
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment H-8208 filed.
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2526.
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as [].
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report, approving bill.
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2022 12:00PM Room G15.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2022 8:30AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult.
- Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Boden and Wolfe.
- Introduced, referred to State Government.
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Smith, R., Cournoyer, and Jochum.
- Introduced, referred to State Government.