+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 96 nays none.
- Substituted for HF 713.
- Withdrawn.
- SF 364 substituted.
- Amendment H-1045 adopted.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
- Message from Senate.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3069 filed, adopted.
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1045 filed.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2019 3:30PM House Lounge.
- Subcommittee: Thorup, Fisher and Olson.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Public Safety.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Dawson, Bisignano and Whiting.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY
Type:
Primary Sponsor