+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Signed by Governor.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 90, nays 6.
- Substituted for HF 683.
- Withdrawn.
- SF 534 substituted.
- Amendment H-1051 adopted.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1051 filed.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 3.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/04/2019 3:00PM House Lounge.
- Subcommittee: Sorensen, Landon and Williams.
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Brown, Dawson, and Quirmbach.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor