+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On June 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On June 13, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 96, nays none.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-8305.
On June 12, 2020 in the House:
- Senate amendment H-8305 filed.
- Message from Senate.
On June 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 4.
- Amendment S-5113B adopted.
- Amendment S-5113A adopted.
- Amendment S-5145 to S-5113 filed, adopted.
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5113 filed.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/12/2020 12:00PM RM 315.
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Johnson, Celsi, and Whiting.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to State Government.
- Message from House.
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 97, nays none.
- Amendment H-8044 adopted.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Amendment H-8044 filed.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2020 2:30PM House Lounge.
- Subcommittee: Lundgren, Sexton and Lensing.