+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Costello, Edler, and Mathis.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Human Resources.
- Message from House.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 96, nays none.
- Amendment H-1082 adopted.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1082 filed.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/05/2019 8:15AM House Lounge.
- Subcommittee: Best, Forbes and Lundgren.
- Introduced, referred to Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor