+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (41)
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- SF 590 substituted.
- Immediate message.
- Substituted for HF 675.
- Passed House, yeas 77 nays 21.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
- Message from Senate.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 17.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/20/2019 11:00AM House Lounge.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: McKean, Hite and Konfrst.
- Subcommittee: Garrett, Dawson and Hogg.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY
Type:
Primary Sponsor