+ − Transition
HSB674 is now SF2208
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Sinclair, Boulton, and Zaun.
- Read first time, referred to Judiciary.
- Message from House.
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 91, nays 2.
- Amendment H-8157 adopted.
- Amendment H-8173 to H-8157 withdrawn.
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment H-8173 filed.
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment H-8157 filed.
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2506.
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Nunn, Mathis, and Williams.
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
- Subcommittee reassigned: Sorensen, Hall and Lohse.
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Commerce.
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2022 5:15PM House Lounge 2.
- Subcommittee: Sorensen, Lohse and Smith.
- Introduced, referred to Information Technology.