+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Bolkcom, Feenstra, and Quirmbach. S.J. 613.
- Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 611.
- Message from House. S.J. 611.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 549.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 532.
- Passed House, ayes 81, nays 17. H.J. 530.
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Fiscal note. HCS.
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 498.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 485.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (4)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor