+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Attached to similar HF 662.
- Read first time, attached to similar SF 375.
- Message from House.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 100, nays none.
- Amendment H-8106 adopted.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Amendment H-8106 filed.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on calendar.
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Passed subcommittee.
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2020 11:30AM RM G17.
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Hite, Paustian and Wilburn.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/21/2020 12:00PM House Lounge.
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Nunn, R. Taylor, and Whiting.
On April 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
- Referred to Judiciary.
On April 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2019 8:00AM House Lounge.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Hite, Paustian and Sunde.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Hite, Paustian and Sunde.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Nunn, Taylor, R. and Whiting.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY
Type:
Primary Sponsor