+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/26/2019 2:15PM House Lounge.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Nielsen and Osmundson.
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Ways and Means.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/05/2019 1:45PM House Lounge.
- Subcommittee: Jacobsen, Bergan and Konfrst.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT
Type:
Primary Sponsor