+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor. H.J. 896.
On May 9, 2014 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 896.
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 896.
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 888.
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 850.
- Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 847.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-8222. H.J. 847.
- Amendment H-8254 to Senate amendment H-8222 withdrawn. H.J. 847.
- Amendment H-8232 to Senate amendment H-8222 withdrawn. H.J. 846.
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment H-8254 filed. H.J. 716.
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment H-8232 filed. H.J. 692.
- Senate amendment H-8222 filed. H.J. 692.
- Message from Senate. H.J. 682.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5131 filed, adopted. S.J. 729.
- Deferred. S.J. 724.
- Amendment S-5109 adopted. S.J. 729.
- Point of order raised on S-5132, ruled out of order. S.J. 730.
- Amendment S-5132 filed. S.J. 730.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 730.
- Immediate message. S.J. 730.
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5109 filed. S.J. 674.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 674.
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Hogg, Feenstra, and Seng. S.J. 613.
- Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 611.
- Message from House. S.J. 611.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 549.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 532.
- Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 531.
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 498.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 485.
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor