+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Lykam, and Shipley.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Transportation.
- Message from House.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 99, nays none.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2019 8:30AM House Lounge.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Best, A. Meyer and Heddens.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION
Type:
Primary Sponsor