+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 91, nays 6.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-8065.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Senate amendment H-8065 filed.
- Message from Senate.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 41, nays 8.
- Amendment S-5039 adopted.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5039 filed.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2020 8:45AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee reassigned: R. Smith, Schultz, and T. Taylor.
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee reassigned: R. Smith, Giddens, and Schultz.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/27/2019 12:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee reassigned: Miller-Meeks, Chapman, and Giddens.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Miller-Meeks, Chapman, and Lykam.
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to State Government.
- Message from House.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 87, nays 9.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2019 8:00AM House Lounge.
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Bossman, Bergan and Lensing.