+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Wilhelm, Brase, and Guth. S.J. 536.
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 468.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Local Government. S.J. 491.
- Message from House. S.J. 491.
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 446.
- Passed House, ayes 98, nays 1. H.J. 440.
- Amendment H-8037 adopted. H.J. 440.
- Motion to suspend rules prevailed. H.J. 439.
- Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-8037. H.J. 439.
- Ruled not germane amendment H-8037. H.J. 439.
- Point of order raised amendment H-8037 not germane. H.J. 439.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment H-8037 filed. H.J. 353.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 317.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (4)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor