+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President.
- Sent to Governor.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 97, nays 1.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-1416.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Substituted for SF 176.
- Amendment S-3345 adopted.
- Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays 0.
- Amendment S-3344 adopted.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
- Senate amendment H-1416 filed.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- HF 621 substituted.
- Withdrawn.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3344 filed.
- Amendment S-3345 filed.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
- Read first time and attached to similar SF 176.
- Attached to similar HF 621.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 77, nays 19.
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Mohr, Bennett and Bergan.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Ways and Means.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2017 8:00AM House Lounge
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Sieck, Carlson and Gaskill.
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2017 2:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Zumbach, Boulton, and C. Johnson.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS
Type:
Primary Sponsor