+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President.
- Sent to Governor.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn.
- HF 2359 substituted.
- Amendment S-5015 adopted.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none.
- Substituted for SF 2283.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Passed House, ayes 95, nays none.
- Committee amendment H-8019 adopted.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time and attached to similar Senate File 2283.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Immediate message.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Committee amendment H-8019 filed.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5015 filed.
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Judiciary: Paulsen Chair, Olson, Windschitl
- Recorded