+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President.
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays 0.
- Substituted for SF 2166.
- Withdrawn.
- HF 2318 substituted.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Deferred.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Attached to companion HF 2318.
- Message from House.
- Read first time and attached to companion SF 2166.
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 97 nays none.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2018 11:00AM House Lounge
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee: McKean, Bossman and Bennett.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/29/2018 11:30AM RM 315
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Dawson, Edler, and Bisignano.