+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn.
- Withdrawn.
- HF 2363 substituted.
- Withdrawn.
- HF 2363 substituted.
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 1.
- Substituted for SF 2304.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Passed House, yeas 89, nays 7.
- Immediate message.
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
- Read first time, attached to companion SF 2304.
- Attached to companion HF 2363.
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28.
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2304.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2020 8:00AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2020 9:30AM House Lounge.
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Thompson, Brink and Kacena.
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Brown, Carlin, and Dotzler.