+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker.
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- Substituted SF 130.
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 99, nays none.
- Substituted for HF 386.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
- Message from Senate.
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 3:00PM House Lounge
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Veterans Affairs: Kaufmann Chair, Meyer, Nunn
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Recorded
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor