+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On May 27, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President.
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, McCoy, Allen, and Schultz.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Ways & Means.
- Message from House.
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- Passed House, ayes 99, nays none.
- Immediate message.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Fiscal note. House Clip Sheet.
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Passed subcommittee.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Sands, Kelley, and Maxwell.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 12:30PM House Lounge
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Commerce: Sands Chair, Holz, Kressig
- Recorded