+ − Transition
HSB594 is now HF2128
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (43)
On June 24, 2022 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 16, 2022 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5143 adopted.
- Passed Senate, yeas 42, nays 3.
- Immediate message.
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
- Senate amendment H-8367 filed.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-8367.
- Passed House, yeas 81, nays 13.
- Explanation of vote.
- Immediate message.
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5143 filed.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Brown, Dawson, Petersen, Sweeney, and T. Taylor.
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Zumbach, Costello, and Ragan. S.J. 224
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Agriculture.
- Message from House.
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 82, nays 10.
- Amendment H-8005 adopted.
- Amendment H-8006 to H-8005 filed, withdrawn.
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment H-8005 filed.
- Fiscal note.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2022 10:30AM Room 217 Conference Room.
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Zumbach, Costello, and Ragan.
- Introduced, referred to Agriculture.
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2128.
- Committee report, recommending passage.
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2022 12:30PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber.
- Subcommittee: Hein, Maxwell and Wolfe.
- Introduced, referred to Ways and Means.