+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 96 nays none.
- Substituted for HF 2308.
- Withdrawn.
- SF 2262 substituted.
- Amendment H-8088 adopted.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment H-8088 filed.
- Message from Senate.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2018 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
- Subcommittee: Feenstra, C. Johnson, and Allen.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2018 12:30PM House Lounge
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2018 11:30AM House Lounge (Cancelled)
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Best, Wills and Kacena.